House | 04/16/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1267 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1267 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1183 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 988 | |
Senate | 04/09/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 484 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |