House | 05/13/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1678 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1354 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1275 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1275 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1275 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1275 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Van de Putte | Journal Page: 1273 |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1273 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1272 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1012 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 485 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 485 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |