Senate | 03/18/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 585 | |
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 02/26/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |