House | 04/30/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1345 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1345 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1345 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1345 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1345 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1345 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Lucio | Journal Page: 1344 |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1140 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 488 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 488 | |
Senate | 02/26/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |