House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3677 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2442 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2385 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2384 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2139 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 491 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 491 | |
Senate | 02/27/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |