E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5984
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4462
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4462
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5195
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1385
|
Journal Page: 5194
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5194
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3164
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2639
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2639
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4253
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4253
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4220
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4220
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4220
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3246
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#776
|
Journal Page: 3245
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3245
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
5-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3245
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3244
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3244
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3168
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#744
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2378
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 2293
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2293
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1429
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1428
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1353
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 545
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 545
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|