Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1237 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 1237
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the authority of certain juvenile probation officers to
66 carry firearms.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. The heading to Section 141.066, Human Resources
99 Code, is amended to read as follows:
1010 Sec. 141.066. [PROHIBITION ON] CARRYING OF FIREARM BY
1111 CERTAIN OFFICERS PROHIBITED.
1212 SECTION 2. Subsection (b), Section 141.066, Human Resources
1313 Code, is amended to read as follows:
1414 (b) This section does not apply to:
1515 (1) an employee of the Texas Youth Commission; or
1616 (2) a juvenile probation officer authorized to carry a
1717 firearm under Section 142.006.
1818 SECTION 3. Chapter 142, Human Resources Code, is amended by
1919 adding Section 142.006 to read as follows:
2020 Sec. 142.006. AUTHORIZATION TO CARRY FIREARM. (a) A
2121 juvenile probation officer may carry a firearm in the course of the
2222 officer's official duties if:
2323 (1) the juvenile probation officer possesses a
2424 certificate of firearms proficiency issued by the Commission on Law
2525 Enforcement Officer Standards and Education under Section
2626 1701.258, Occupations Code;
2727 (2) the chief juvenile probation officer of the
2828 juvenile probation department that employs the juvenile probation
2929 officer authorizes the juvenile probation officer to carry a
3030 firearm in the course of the officer's official duties; and
3131 (3) the juvenile probation officer has been employed
3232 for at least one year by the juvenile probation department
3333 described by Subdivision (2).
3434 (b) A juvenile probation officer is disqualified from being
3535 authorized to carry a firearm under this section if the officer has
3636 been designated a perpetrator in a Texas Juvenile Probation
3737 Commission abuse, neglect, or exploitation investigation.
3838 (c) This section does not affect the sovereign immunity of
3939 the state, an agency of the state, or a political subdivision of the
4040 state.
4141 SECTION 4. Subsection (a), Section 46.15, Penal Code, as
4242 amended by Chapters 1214 (H.B. 1889) and 1222 (H.B. 2300), Acts of
4343 the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is reenacted and
4444 amended to read as follows:
4545 (a) Sections 46.02 and 46.03 do not apply to:
4646 (1) peace officers or special investigators under
4747 Article 2.122, Code of Criminal Procedure, and neither section
4848 prohibits a peace officer or special investigator from carrying a
4949 weapon in this state, including in an establishment in this state
5050 serving the public, regardless of whether the peace officer or
5151 special investigator is engaged in the actual discharge of the
5252 officer's or investigator's duties while carrying the weapon;
5353 (2) parole officers and neither section prohibits an
5454 officer from carrying a weapon in this state if the officer is:
5555 (A) engaged in the actual discharge of the
5656 officer's duties while carrying the weapon; and
5757 (B) in compliance with policies and procedures
5858 adopted by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice regarding the
5959 possession of a weapon by an officer while on duty;
6060 (3) community supervision and corrections department
6161 officers appointed or employed under Section 76.004, Government
6262 Code, and neither section prohibits an officer from carrying a
6363 weapon in this state if the officer is:
6464 (A) engaged in the actual discharge of the
6565 officer's duties while carrying the weapon; and
6666 (B) authorized to carry a weapon under Section
6767 76.0051, Government Code;
6868 (4) a judge or justice of a federal court, the supreme
6969 court, the court of criminal appeals, a court of appeals, a district
7070 court, a criminal district court, a constitutional county court, a
7171 statutory county court, a justice court, or a municipal court who is
7272 licensed to carry a concealed handgun under Subchapter H, Chapter
7373 411, Government Code;
7474 (5) an honorably retired peace officer or federal
7575 criminal investigator who holds a certificate of proficiency issued
7676 under Section 1701.357, Occupations Code, and is carrying a photo
7777 identification that:
7878 (A) verifies that the officer honorably retired
7979 after not less than 15 years of service as a commissioned officer;
8080 and
8181 (B) is issued by a state or local law enforcement
8282 agency;
8383 (6) a district attorney, criminal district attorney,
8484 county attorney, or municipal attorney who is licensed to carry a
8585 concealed handgun under Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code;
8686 [or]
8787 (7) an assistant district attorney, assistant
8888 criminal district attorney, or assistant county attorney who is
8989 licensed to carry a concealed handgun under Subchapter H, Chapter
9090 411, Government Code;
9191 (8) [(7)] a bailiff designated by an active judicial
9292 officer as defined by Section 411.201, Government Code, who is:
9393 (A) licensed to carry a concealed handgun under
9494 Chapter 411, Government Code; and
9595 (B) engaged in escorting the judicial officer; or
9696 (9) a juvenile probation officer who is authorized to
9797 carry a firearm under Section 142.006, Human Resources Code.
9898 SECTION 5. Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
9999 amended by adding Section 1701.258 to read as follows:
100100 Sec. 1701.258. FIREARMS TRAINING PROGRAM FOR JUVENILE
101101 PROBATION OFFICERS. (a) The commission and the Texas Juvenile
102102 Probation Commission by rule shall adopt a memorandum of
103103 understanding that establishes a training program in the use of
104104 firearms by juvenile probation officers. The memorandum of
105105 understanding must establish a program that provides instruction
106106 in:
107107 (1) legal limitations on the use of firearms and on the
108108 powers and authority of juvenile probation officers;
109109 (2) range firing and procedure, and firearms safety
110110 and maintenance; and
111111 (3) other topics determined by the commission and the
112112 Texas Juvenile Probation Commission to be necessary for the
113113 responsible use of firearms by juvenile probation officers.
114114 (b) The commission shall administer the training program
115115 and shall issue a certificate of firearms proficiency to each
116116 juvenile probation officer the commission determines has
117117 successfully completed the program described by Subsection (a).
118118 (c) The commission may establish reasonable and necessary
119119 fees for the administration of this section.
120120 (d) This section does not affect the sovereign immunity of
121121 the state, an agency of the state, or a political subdivision of the
122122 state.
123123 SECTION 6. The Commission on Law Enforcement Officer
124124 Standards and Education and the Texas Juvenile Probation Commission
125125 shall adopt the memorandum of understanding required by Section
126126 1701.258, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not later than
127127 January 1, 2010.
128128 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
129129 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
130130 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
131131 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
132132 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
133133 ______________________________ ______________________________
134134 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
135135 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1237 passed the Senate on
136136 April 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0;
137137 May 20, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
138138 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 21, 2009, House
139139 granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2009, Senate adopted
140140 Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 30,
141141 Nays 1.
142142 ______________________________
143143 Secretary of the Senate
144144 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1237 passed the House, with
145145 amendments, on May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
146146 Nays 3, three present not voting; May 21, 2009, House granted
147147 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
148148 May 28, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
149149 following vote: Yeas 130, Nays 13, one present not voting.
150150 ______________________________
151151 Chief Clerk of the House
152152 Approved:
153153 ______________________________
154154 Date
155155 ______________________________
156156 Governor