Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB129 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 129


 AN ACT
 relating to the maximum speed limit for a neighborhood electric
 vehicle being operated on a street or highway and to the operation
 of a motorcycle.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subdivision (1), Section 551.301,
 Transportation Code, as amended by Chapters 281 (H.B. 2702) and
 1242 (H.B. 1596), Acts of the 79th Legislature, Regular Session,
 2005, is reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (1) "Neighborhood electric vehicle" means a vehicle
 that can attain a maximum speed of 35 miles per hour on a paved level
 surface and otherwise complies with [subject to] Federal Motor
 Vehicle Safety Standard 500 (49 C.F.R. Section 571.500).
 SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 551.303, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) A neighborhood electric vehicle may be operated only on
 a street or highway for which the posted speed limit is 45 [35]
 miles per hour or less. A neighborhood electric vehicle may cross a
 road or street at an intersection where the road or street has a
 posted speed limit of more than 45 [35] miles per hour. A
 neighborhood electric vehicle may not be operated on a street or
 highway at a speed that exceeds the lesser of:
 (1) the posted speed limit; or
 (2) 35 miles per hour.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (a), Section 521.001, Transportation
 Code, is amended by adding Subdivision (6-a) to read as follows:
 (6-a)  "Motorcycle" includes an enclosed three-wheeled
 passenger vehicle that:
 (A)  is designed to operate with three wheels in
 contact with the ground;
 (B) has a minimum unladen weight of 900 lbs.;
 (C)  has a single, completely enclosed, occupant
 compartment;
 (D) at a minimum, is equipped with:
 (i)  seats that are certified by the vehicle
 manufacturer to meet the requirements of Federal Motor Vehicle
 Safety Standard No. 207, 49 C.F.R. Section 571.207;
 (ii)  a steering wheel used to maneuver the
 vehicle;
 (iii)  a propulsion unit located in front of
 or behind the enclosed occupant compartment;
 (iv)  a seat belt for each vehicle occupant
 certified by the manufacturer to meet the requirements of Federal
 Motor Vehicle Safety Standard No. 209, 49 C.F.R. Section 571.209;
 (v)  a windshield and one or more windshield
 wipers certified by the manufacturer to meet the requirements of
 Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standard No. 205, 49 C.F.R. Section
 571.205, and Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standard No. 104, 49
 C.F.R. Section 571.104; and
 (vi)  a vehicle structure certified by the
 vehicle manufacturer to meet the requirements of Federal Motor
 Vehicle Safety Standard No. 216, 49 C.F.R. Section 571.216; and
 (E)  is produced by its manufacturer in a minimum
 quantity of 300 in any calendar year.
 SECTION 4. Section 521.085, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.085. TYPE OF VEHICLE AUTHORIZED. (a) Unless
 prohibited by Chapter 522, and except as provided by Subsection
 (b), the license holder may operate any vehicle of the type for
 which that class of license is issued and any lesser type of vehicle
 other than a motorcycle or moped.
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not prohibit a license holder from
 operating a lesser type of vehicle that is a motorcycle described by
 Section 521.001(a)(6-a).
 SECTION 5. Subdivision (1), Section 661.001,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (1) "Motorcycle" means a motor vehicle designed to
 propel itself with not more than three wheels in contact with the
 ground, and having a saddle for the use of the rider. The term does
 not include a tractor or a three-wheeled vehicle equipped with a cab
 or occupant compartment, seat, and seat belt and designed to
 contain the operator in the cab or occupant compartment.
 SECTION 6. Section 680.013, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 680.013. USE OF PREFERENTIAL LANE BY MOTORCYCLE. A
 motorcycle, including a motorcycle described by Section
 521.001(a)(6-a), may be operated in a preferential lane that is not
 closed to all vehicular traffic.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 129 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 129 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor