Senate | 04/15/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 550 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 550 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |