Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1292 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa, Lucio S.B. No. 1292
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 1, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 1, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the calculation of current market value of certain
 water rights by the Rio Grande Regional Water Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 49.509, Water Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (a) Subject to Subsection (d), the [The] Rio Grande Regional
 Water Authority annually at its January meeting shall calculate the
 current market value by using the average price per acre-foot of
 municipal use water after conversion from irrigation use water to
 municipal use water with a municipal priority of allocation under
 commission rules of the last three purchases involving:
 (1) a municipal water supplier;
 (2) a party other than a municipal water supplier; and
 (3) at least 100 acre-feet of municipal use water,
 with municipal priority of allocation.
 (d)  The Rio Grande Regional Water Authority shall exclude
 from the calculation of current market value under Subsection (a)
 any sale between a municipal water supplier and a district if any
 part of the district's territory is subject to the municipal water
 supplier's certificate of convenience and necessity.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a calculation of current market value of certain water rights
 made by the Rio Grande Regional Water Authority on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A calculation of current market value
 that is made before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect when the calculation was made, and the former law
 continues in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *