E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5977
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4137
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4207
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1365
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4639
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4639
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4639
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2293
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2293
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1869
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 878
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Refer to s/c on Flooding & Evacuations by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|