E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6036
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4675
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4675
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4675
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4674
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4192
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5054
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5054
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3299
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2241
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 551
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 551
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|