Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1304 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1304


 AN ACT
 relating to notice to students of a public institution of higher
 education of the required use of a portion of a student's tuition
 payments to provide student financial aid.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 56, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 56.014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 56.014.  NOTICE TO STUDENTS REGARDING TUITION SET ASIDE
 FOR FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (a)  An institution of higher education
 that is required by this subchapter to set aside a portion of a
 student's tuition payments to provide financial assistance for
 students enrolled in the institution shall provide to each student
 of the institution who pays tuition from which a portion is required
 to be set aside for that purpose a notice regarding the specific
 amount that is required to be set aside by the institution.
 (b)  The institution shall provide the notice required by
 Subsection (a) to the student in a prominently printed statement
 that appears on or is included with:
 (1)  the student's tuition bill or billing statement,
 if the institution provides the student with a printed bill or
 billing statement for the payment of the student's tuition; or
 (2)  the student's tuition receipt, if the institution
 provides the student with a printed receipt evidencing the payment
 of the student's tuition.
 (c)  If for any semester or other academic term the
 institution does not provide the student with a printed tuition
 bill, tuition billing statement, or tuition receipt, the
 institution shall include the notice required by Subsection (a) for
 that semester or other term in a statement prominently displayed in
 an e-mail sent to the student. The notice may be included in any
 other e-mail sent to the student in connection with the student's
 tuition charges for that semester or other term.
 (d)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board by rule
 shall prescribe minimum standards for the manner, form, and content
 of the notice required by this section.
 SECTION 2. (a) Section 56.014, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies beginning with tuition charged for the 2010
 spring semester.
 (b) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 adopt the rules required by Section 56.014, Education Code, as
 added by this Act, as soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act. For that purpose, the coordinating board may adopt the
 initial rules in the manner provided by law for emergency rules.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1304 passed the Senate on
 May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1304 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor