E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
March 1, 2010
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4717
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4717
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4717
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4716
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4193
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5054
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5054
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 3436
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3436
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2334
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2334
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2334
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2334
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
FA1 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Patrick
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2021
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 992
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 838
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 552
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|