Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1317 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1317


 AN ACT
 relating to education and examination requirements for the issuance
 of a driver's license to certain persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (d), Section 521.142, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d) If the applicant is under 25 years of age, the
 application must state whether the applicant has completed a driver
 education course required by Section 521.1601 [approved by the
 department].
 SECTION 2. The heading to Subchapter H, Chapter 521,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H. EDUCATION AND EXAMINATION REQUIREMENTS
 SECTION 3. Subchapter H, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 521.1601 and 521.167 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 521.1601.  DRIVER EDUCATION REQUIRED. The department
 may not issue a driver's license to a person who is younger than 25
 years of age unless the person submits to the department a driver
 education certificate issued under Chapter 1001, Education Code,
 that states that the person has completed and passed:
 (1)  a driver education and traffic safety course
 approved by the Texas Education Agency under Section 29.902,
 Education Code, or a driver education course approved by that
 agency under Section 1001.101(a)(1) of that code or approved by the
 department under Section 521.205; or
 (2)  if the person is 18 years of age or older, a driver
 education course approved by the Texas Education Agency under
 Section 1001.101(a)(1) or (2), Education Code.
 Sec. 521.167.  WAIVER OF CERTAIN EDUCATION AND EXAMINATION
 REQUIREMENTS. A person who has completed and passed a driver
 education course approved by the Texas Education Agency under
 Section 1001.101(a)(2), Education Code, is not required to take the
 highway sign and traffic law parts of the examination required
 under Section 521.161 if those parts have been successfully
 completed as determined by a licensed driver education instructor.
 SECTION 4. Section 1001.004, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.004. COST OF ADMINISTERING CHAPTER. (a)  Except
 as provided by Subsection (b), the [The] cost of administering this
 chapter shall be included in the state budget allowance for the
 agency.
 (b)  The commissioner may charge a fee to each driver
 education school in an amount not to exceed the actual expense
 incurred in the regulation of driver education courses established
 under Section 1001.101(a)(2).
 SECTION 5. Subsection (a), Section 1001.055, Education
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The agency shall print and supply to each licensed or
 exempt driver education school driver education certificates to be
 used for certifying completion of an approved driver education
 course to satisfy the requirements of Sections [Section]
 521.204(a)(2) and 521.1601, Transportation Code. The certificates
 must be numbered serially.
 SECTION 6. Section 1001.101, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.101. DRIVER EDUCATION COURSE CURRICULUM AND
 EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS [TEXTBOOKS]. (a) The commissioner by rule
 shall establish the curriculum and designate the educational
 materials [textbooks] to be used in:
 (1) a driver education course for minors and adults;
 and
 (2) a driver education course exclusively for adults.
 (b) A driver education course under Subsection (a)(2) must:
 (1) be a six-hour course; and
 (2) include instruction in:
 (A) alcohol and drug awareness;
 (B) the traffic laws of this state;
 (C)  highway signs, signals, and markings that
 regulate, warn, or direct traffic; and
 (D)  the issues commonly associated with motor
 vehicle accidents, including poor decision-making, risk taking,
 impaired driving, distraction, speed, failure to use a safety belt,
 driving at night, failure to yield the right-of-way, and using a
 wireless communication device while operating a vehicle.
 (c)  A course approved under Subsection (a)(2) may be offered
 as an online course.
 (d)  A driving safety course or a drug and alcohol driving
 awareness program may not be approved as a driver education course
 under Subsection (a)(2).
 SECTION 7. The changes in law made by this Act apply to an
 application for the issuance of a driver's license filed on or after
 the effective date of this Act. An application for the issuance of
 a driver's license filed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date of the filing, and that law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect March 1, 2010.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1317 passed the Senate on
 May 13, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 23, Nays 8; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 23, Nays 8.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1317 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 3, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor