E | 05/27/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/27/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4093 | |
E | 05/19/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2568 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4073 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2534 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#875 | Journal Page: 3728 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3728 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3728 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3714 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3714 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB3760 | Journal Page: 3714 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1218 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1006 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 556 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 556 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |