House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1657
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1299
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 556
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|