E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5982
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4311
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4311
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4311
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4310
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3461
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4887
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1246
|
Journal Page: 4886
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4886
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4886
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4473
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4473
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3953
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2207
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1761
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1319
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1319
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1319
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1319
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1318
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1318
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1318
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 560
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 560
|
Senate
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|