Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1402 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1402


 AN ACT
 relating to requiring certain political subdivisions to enter a
 contract with the county elections administrator to perform
 election services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 31, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 31.0925 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.0925.  REQUEST FOR SERVICES REQUIRED. (a)  This
 section applies only to a political subdivision:
 (1) that is located entirely in a county:
 (A)  with a population of more than 500,000 that
 is served by a county elections administrator; and
 (B)  that does not contain a municipality with a
 population of more than 150,000; and
 (2)  that is not an irrigation district created under
 the authority of Section 52(b)(1) or (2), Article III, or Section
 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution.
 (b)  The governing body of a political subdivision shall
 request an election services contract with the county elections
 administrator to perform all duties and functions of the political
 subdivision in relation to an election that may be transferred
 under this subchapter if the political subdivision receives a
 petition requesting the contract signed by a number of registered
 voters residing in the political subdivision that is equal to or
 exceeds one percent of all votes cast in the most recent general
 election held by the political subdivision.
 (c)  A petition under this section must be submitted to the
 clerk of the political subdivision before January 1 of the year in
 which the election to be administered under the requested election
 services contract will be held.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1402 passed the Senate on
 April 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1402 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor