House | 05/12/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2426 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2426 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2007 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1674 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1674 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1674 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1673 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |