Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1415 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 1415
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to certain corrective actions by the Texas Board of
66 Nursing, including a pilot program on deferred disciplinary action;
77 providing corrective actions.
88 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
99 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is
1010 amended by adding Section 301.1607 to read as follows:
1111 Sec. 301.1607. PILOT PROGRAM ON DEFERRAL OF FINAL
1212 DISCIPLINARY ACTION. (a) In this section, "deferred disciplinary
1313 action" means a final disciplinary action against a person licensed
1414 or regulated under this chapter that is deferred by the board as
1515 provided by this section.
1616 (b) Not later than February 1, 2010, the board shall
1717 determine the feasibility of conducting a pilot program designed to
1818 evaluate the efficacy and effect on the public's protection of
1919 board deferral of disciplinary action against a person licensed or
2020 regulated under this chapter in cases in which the board proposes to
2121 impose a sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or
2222 revocation of a license. If the board determines the pilot program
2323 is feasible, the board shall develop and implement the pilot
2424 program not later than February 1, 2011. The pilot program must
2525 conclude not later than January 1, 2014.
2626 (c) The pilot program may not include cases in which the
2727 board proposes to issue a reprimand or to deny, suspend, or revoke a
2828 license.
2929 (d) During the time the pilot program is implemented and for
3030 any action or complaint for which the board proposes to impose a
3131 sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or
3232 revocation of a license, the board may:
3333 (1) defer final disciplinary action the board has
3434 proposed against a person licensed or regulated under this chapter
3535 if the person conforms to conditions imposed by the board,
3636 including any condition the board could impose as a condition of
3737 probation under Section 301.468; and
3838 (2) if the person successfully meets the imposed
3939 conditions, dismiss the complaint.
4040 (e) Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a
4141 deferred disciplinary action by the board under the pilot program
4242 is not confidential and is subject to disclosure in accordance with
4343 Chapter 552, Government Code. If the person successfully meets the
4444 conditions imposed by the board in deferring final disciplinary
4545 action and the board dismisses the action or complaint, the
4646 deferred disciplinary action of the board is confidential to the
4747 same extent as a complaint filed under Section 301.466.
4848 (f) The board may treat a deferred disciplinary action taken
4949 against a nurse under this section as a prior disciplinary action
5050 against the nurse when considering the imposition of a sanction for
5151 a subsequent violation of this chapter or a rule or order adopted
5252 under this chapter.
5353 (g) The board may contract with a third party to evaluate
5454 the pilot program established under this section.
5555 (h) The board shall appoint an advisory committee to assist
5656 the board in overseeing the pilot program and its evaluation. The
5757 committee must include representatives of public advocacy
5858 organizations.
5959 (i) This section expires September 1, 2014.
6060 SECTION 2. Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is amended by
6161 adding Subchapter N to read as follows:
6262 SUBCHAPTER N. CORRECTIVE ACTION PROCEEDING
6363 Sec. 301.651. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "corrective
6464 action" means a fine or remedial education imposed under Section
6565 301.652.
6666 Sec. 301.652. IMPOSITION OF CORRECTIVE ACTION. (a) The
6767 board may impose a corrective action on a person licensed or
6868 regulated under this chapter who violates this chapter or a rule or
6969 order adopted under this chapter. The corrective action:
7070 (1) may be a fine, remedial education, or any
7171 combination of a fine or remedial education;
7272 (2) is not a disciplinary action under Subchapter J;
7373 and
7474 (3) is subject to disclosure only to the extent a
7575 complaint is subject to disclosure under Section 301.466.
7676 (b) The board by rule shall adopt guidelines for the types
7777 of violations for which a corrective action may be imposed.
7878 Sec. 301.653. REPORT AND NOTICE OF VIOLATION AND CORRECTIVE
7979 ACTION. If the executive director determines that a person has
8080 committed a violation for which a corrective action may be imposed
8181 under the guidelines adopted under Section 301.652(b), the
8282 executive director may give written notice of the determination and
8383 recommendation for corrective action to the person subject to the
8484 corrective action. The notice may be given by certified mail. The
8585 notice must:
8686 (1) include a brief summary of the alleged violation;
8787 (2) state the recommended corrective action; and
8888 (3) inform the person of the person's options in
8989 responding to the notice.
9090 Sec. 301.654. RESPONSE. Not later than the 20th day after
9191 the date the person receives the notice under Section 301.653, the
9292 person may:
9393 (1) accept in writing the executive director's
9494 determination and recommended corrective action; or
9595 (2) reject the executive director's determination and
9696 recommended corrective action.
9797 Sec. 301.655. ACTION FOLLOWING RESPONSE. (a) If the
9898 person accepts the executive director's determination and
9999 satisfies the recommended corrective action, the case is closed.
100100 (b) If the person does not accept the executive director's
101101 determination and recommended corrective action as originally
102102 proposed or as modified by the board or fails to respond in a timely
103103 manner to the executive director's notice as provided by Section
104104 301.654, the executive director shall:
105105 (1) terminate proceedings under this subchapter; and
106106 (2) dispose of the matter as a complaint under
107107 Subchapter J.
108108 Sec. 301.656. REPORT TO BOARD. The executive director
109109 shall report periodically to the board on the corrective actions
110110 imposed under this subchapter, including:
111111 (1) the number of corrective actions imposed;
112112 (2) the types of violations for which corrective
113113 actions were imposed; and
114114 (3) whether affected nurses accepted the corrective
115115 actions.
116116 Sec. 301.657. EFFECT ON ACCEPTANCE OF CORRECTIVE ACTION.
117117 (a) Except to the extent provided by this section, a person's
118118 acceptance of a corrective action under this subchapter does not
119119 constitute an admission of a violation but does constitute a plea of
120120 nolo contendere.
121121 (b) The board may treat a person's acceptance of corrective
122122 action as an admission of a violation if the board imposes a
123123 sanction on the person for a subsequent violation of this chapter or
124124 a rule or order adopted under this chapter.
125125 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Chapter
126126 301, Occupations Code, apply to actions for violations under
127127 Chapter 301 pending on the effective date of this Act or commenced
128128 on or after the effective date of this Act.
129129 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
130130 ______________________________ ______________________________
131131 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
132132 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1415 passed the Senate on
133133 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
134134 ______________________________
135135 Secretary of the Senate
136136 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1415 passed the House on
137137 May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one
138138 present not voting.
139139 ______________________________
140140 Chief Clerk of the House
141141 Approved:
142142 ______________________________
143143 Date
144144 ______________________________
145145 Governor