Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1415 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1415


 AN ACT
 relating to certain corrective actions by the Texas Board of
 Nursing, including a pilot program on deferred disciplinary action;
 providing corrective actions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.1607 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.1607.  PILOT PROGRAM ON DEFERRAL OF FINAL
 DISCIPLINARY ACTION.  (a)  In this section, "deferred disciplinary
 action" means a final disciplinary action against a person licensed
 or regulated under this chapter that is deferred by the board as
 provided by this section.
 (b)  Not later than February 1, 2010, the board shall
 determine the feasibility of conducting a pilot program designed to
 evaluate the efficacy and effect on the public's protection of
 board deferral of disciplinary action against a person licensed or
 regulated under this chapter in cases in which the board proposes to
 impose a sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or
 revocation of a license. If the board determines the pilot program
 is feasible, the board shall develop and implement the pilot
 program not later than February 1, 2011. The pilot program must
 conclude not later than January 1, 2014.
 (c)  The pilot program may not include cases in which the
 board proposes to issue a reprimand or to deny, suspend, or revoke a
 license.
 (d)  During the time the pilot program is implemented and for
 any action or complaint for which the board proposes to impose a
 sanction other than a reprimand or a denial, suspension, or
 revocation of a license, the board may:
 (1)  defer final disciplinary action the board has
 proposed against a person licensed or regulated under this chapter
 if the person conforms to conditions imposed by the board,
 including any condition the board could impose as a condition of
 probation under Section 301.468; and
 (2)  if the person successfully meets the imposed
 conditions, dismiss the complaint.
 (e)  Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a
 deferred disciplinary action by the board under the pilot program
 is not confidential and is subject to disclosure in accordance with
 Chapter 552, Government Code. If the person successfully meets the
 conditions imposed by the board in deferring final disciplinary
 action and the board dismisses the action or complaint, the
 deferred disciplinary action of the board is confidential to the
 same extent as a complaint filed under Section 301.466.
 (f)  The board may treat a deferred disciplinary action taken
 against a nurse under this section as a prior disciplinary action
 against the nurse when considering the imposition of a sanction for
 a subsequent violation of this chapter or a rule or order adopted
 under this chapter.
 (g)  The board may contract with a third party to evaluate
 the pilot program established under this section.
 (h)  The board shall appoint an advisory committee to assist
 the board in overseeing the pilot program and its evaluation. The
 committee must include representatives of public advocacy
 organizations.
 (i) This section expires September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter N to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER N.  CORRECTIVE ACTION PROCEEDING
 Sec. 301.651.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "corrective
 action" means a fine or remedial education imposed under Section
 301.652.
 Sec. 301.652.  IMPOSITION OF CORRECTIVE ACTION. (a)  The
 board may impose a corrective action on a person licensed or
 regulated under this chapter who violates this chapter or a rule or
 order adopted under this chapter. The corrective action:
 (1)  may be a fine, remedial education, or any
 combination of a fine or remedial education;
 (2)  is not a disciplinary action under Subchapter J;
 and
 (3)  is subject to disclosure only to the extent a
 complaint is subject to disclosure under Section 301.466.
 (b)  The board by rule shall adopt guidelines for the types
 of violations for which a corrective action may be imposed.
 Sec. 301.653.  REPORT AND NOTICE OF VIOLATION AND CORRECTIVE
 ACTION. If the executive director determines that a person has
 committed a violation for which a corrective action may be imposed
 under the guidelines adopted under Section 301.652(b), the
 executive director may give written notice of the determination and
 recommendation for corrective action to the person subject to the
 corrective action. The notice may be given by certified mail. The
 notice must:
 (1) include a brief summary of the alleged violation;
 (2) state the recommended corrective action; and
 (3)  inform the person of the person's options in
 responding to the notice.
 Sec. 301.654.  RESPONSE. Not later than the 20th day after
 the date the person receives the notice under Section 301.653, the
 person may:
 (1)  accept in writing the executive director's
 determination and recommended corrective action; or
 (2)  reject the executive director's determination and
 recommended corrective action.
 Sec. 301.655.  ACTION FOLLOWING RESPONSE. (a)  If the
 person accepts the executive director's determination and
 satisfies the recommended corrective action, the case is closed.
 (b)  If the person does not accept the executive director's
 determination and recommended corrective action as originally
 proposed or as modified by the board or fails to respond in a timely
 manner to the executive director's notice as provided by Section
 301.654, the executive director shall:
 (1) terminate proceedings under this subchapter; and
 (2)  dispose of the matter as a complaint under
 Subchapter J.
 Sec. 301.656.  REPORT TO BOARD.  The executive director
 shall report periodically to the board on the corrective actions
 imposed under this subchapter, including:
 (1) the number of corrective actions imposed;
 (2)  the types of violations for which corrective
 actions were imposed; and
 (3)  whether affected nurses accepted the corrective
 actions.
 Sec. 301.657.  EFFECT ON ACCEPTANCE OF CORRECTIVE ACTION.
 (a)  Except to the extent provided by this section, a person's
 acceptance of a corrective action under this subchapter does not
 constitute an admission of a violation but does constitute a plea of
 nolo contendere.
 (b)  The board may treat a person's acceptance of corrective
 action as an admission of a violation if the board imposes a
 sanction on the person for a subsequent violation of this chapter or
 a rule or order adopted under this chapter.
 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Chapter
 301, Occupations Code, apply to actions for violations under
 Chapter 301 pending on the effective date of this Act or commenced
 on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1415 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1415 passed the House on
 May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor