Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1420 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R9104 JJT-D
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 1420


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale of electric energy produced by distributed
 renewable generation owners.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 31.002(6), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (6) "Electric utility" means a person or river
 authority that owns or operates for compensation in this state
 equipment or facilities to produce, generate, transmit,
 distribute, sell, or furnish electricity in this state. The term
 includes a lessee, trustee, or receiver of an electric utility and a
 recreational vehicle park owner who does not comply with Subchapter
 C, Chapter 184, with regard to the metered sale of electricity at
 the recreational vehicle park. The term does not include:
 (A) a municipal corporation;
 (B) a qualifying facility;
 (C) a power generation company;
 (D) an exempt wholesale generator;
 (E) a power marketer;
 (F) a corporation described by Section 32.053 to
 the extent the corporation sells electricity exclusively at
 wholesale and not to the ultimate consumer;
 (G) an electric cooperative;
 (H) a retail electric provider;
 (I) this state or an agency of this state; or
 (J) a person not otherwise an electric utility
 who:
 (i) furnishes an electric service or
 commodity only to itself, its employees, or its tenants as an
 incident of employment or tenancy, if that service or commodity is
 not resold to or used by others;
 (ii) owns or operates in this state
 equipment or facilities to produce, generate, transmit,
 distribute, sell, or furnish electric energy to an electric
 utility, if the equipment or facilities are used primarily to
 produce and generate electric energy for consumption by that
 person; [or]
 (iii) owns or operates in this state a
 recreational vehicle park that provides metered electric service in
 accordance with Subchapter C, Chapter 184; or
 (iv)  is a distributed renewable generation
 owner as defined by Section 39.916.
 SECTION 2. Section 39.914(a), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) After December 1, 2009, on the request of an independent
 school district, an [An] electric utility or retail electric
 provider shall provide for net metering and contract with the [an
 independent school] district so that under the contract:
 (1) surplus electricity produced by a school
 building's solar electric generation panels is made available for
 sale to the electric transmission grid and distribution system; and
 (2) the retail [net] value of that surplus electricity
 is credited to the district.
 SECTION 3. Section 39.916(a)(1), Utilities Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (1) "Distributed renewable generation" means electric
 generation with a capacity of not more than 2,000 kilowatts
 provided by a renewable energy technology, as defined by Section
 39.904, that is installed on a retail electric customer's side of
 the meter, including electric generation by solar generating
 equipment connected to the customer's side of the meter but that is
 located elsewhere on the same property or is located on contiguous
 property or on property separated by an easement, a public road, or
 a right-of-way for transportation or utility purposes.
 SECTION 4. Section 39.916, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (k) to read as follows:
 (k)  The commission by rule shall require a retail electric
 provider that offers to purchase excess electricity produced by
 distributed renewable generation to include line items on each bill
 of a customer who is a distributed renewable generation owner that
 inform the customer of:
 (1)  the capacity of the customer's distributed
 renewable generation system;
 (2)  the amount of excess electricity produced by the
 customer's distributed renewable generation system purchased by
 the retail electric provider, in terms of kilowatt hours; and
 (3)  the average price the retail electric utility paid
 for each kilowatt hour of the excess electricity produced by the
 customer's distributed renewable generation system.
 SECTION 5. Subchapter Z, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 39.926 and 39.927 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.926.  INFORMATION ON INTERNET REGARDING PURCHASE OF
 EXCESS ELECTRICITY PRODUCED BY DISTRIBUTED RENEWABLE GENERATION.
 (a) On the Internet website found at http://www.powertochoose.org,
 the commission shall provide for access to easily comparable
 information regarding retail electric providers' offers to
 distributed renewable generation owners for their surplus
 electricity, including information regarding contract terms and
 whether the retail electric provider makes no offer for surplus
 electricity.
 (b)  On the Internet website found at
 http://www.powertochoose.org, the commission shall provide for
 access to easily comparable information regarding offers of
 renewable energy credit marketers to distributed renewable
 generation owners.
 (c)  The commission by rule shall require transmission and
 distribution utilities and retail electric providers to provide on
 publicly accessible Internet websites information on purchase
 price offers per kilowatt hour for excess electricity produced by
 distributed renewable generation and information instructing
 customers with distributed renewable generation on how to request
 and obtain the purchase rates offered.
 Sec. 39.927.  VIABILITY OF MARKET FOR DISTRIBUTED RENEWABLE
 GENERATION EXCESS ENERGY. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Distributed renewable generation" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 39.916.
 (2)  "Excess energy" means electric energy produced by
 a customer's distributed renewable generation installed on the
 customer's side of the meter and made available for sale to the
 electric transmission grid and distribution system.
 (b)  On or before December 1, 2010, the commission by rule
 shall establish criteria for determining whether there is a viable
 market in ERCOT for the sale of excess energy. To be considered
 viable, the market must provide for:
 (1)  each customer in ERCOT to have available at least
 one offer for excess energy at a rate equal to at least 80 percent of
 the retail price for energy; and
 (2)  each customer in ERCOT to have available at least
 two different offers for excess energy in addition to an offer
 described by Subdivision (1).
 (c)  The commission shall require the independent
 organization certified under Section 39.151 to monitor the
 development and implementation of a competitive market in ERCOT for
 the sale of excess energy. The rules must provide a mechanism for
 the organization to monitor retail electric providers' offers to
 purchase excess energy and rates of customers' sales of excess
 energy.
 (d)  Not later than September 1, 2010, the organization shall
 publish and provide to the commission a report that identifies the
 rates of excess energy market participation by retail electric
 providers and customers with distributed renewable generation in
 ERCOT. The report must include:
 (1)  the organization's assessment of the development
 of the market in ERCOT for the sale of excess energy and whether
 that market is viable according to the criteria adopted under
 Subsection (b);
 (2)  the rate of adoption by customers in ERCOT of
 distributed renewable generation by solar energy technologies; and
 (3)  the following information regarding each retail
 electric provider in ERCOT:
 (A)  whether the provider offers to purchase
 excess energy;
 (B)  for a provider that offers to purchase excess
 energy, the provider's:
 (i)  average ratio of retail prices to
 excess energy purchase prices for kilowatt hour units;
 (ii) average monthly purchases; and
 (iii)  average purchases for the year for
 each customer class; and
 (C)  the percentage and number of the provider's
 customers who have adopted distributed renewable generation by
 solar energy technologies.
 (e)  If the independent organization's report under
 Subsection (d) concludes that the market for the sale of excess
 energy is not viable according to the criteria adopted under
 Subsection (b), not later than December 1, 2010, the commission by
 rule shall require all retail electric providers to offer net
 metering services and advanced meter information networks to all
 customers in all customer classes.
 (f)  Subsections (a)-(d) and this subsection expire
 September 2, 2011.
 SECTION 6. Section 39.351, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a distributed renewable
 generation owner as defined by Section 39.916 may generate
 electricity without registering as a power generation company.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.