Senate | 05/05/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 234 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 195 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 195 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |