Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB145 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ellis, et al. S.B. No. 145
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 10, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 29, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 29, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 145 By: West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale by textbook publishers of bundled
 instructional material for use by students at public institutions
 of higher education; providing a penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.9701 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.9701. TEXTBOOK BUNDLES. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Coordinating board" means the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (2)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (3)  "Textbook" means a printed book published
 primarily for the instruction of postsecondary students.
 (4)  "Textbook bundle" means a textbook offered for
 sale in combination with other instructional material, such as:
 (A) additional printed material;
 (B) a computer disk;
 (C) website access; or
 (D) electronically distributed material.
 (5)  "University-affiliated bookstore" means a store
 that:
 (A)  sells instructional material, regardless of
 whether the store is located on the campus of an institution of
 higher education; and
 (B)  is operated by or with the approval of the
 institution through ownership, a management agreement, a lease or
 rental agreement, or otherwise.
 (b)  A publisher that offers a textbook bundle for sale
 directly to students enrolled at an institution of higher education
 or to a university-affiliated bookstore for resale shall:
 (1)  also offer for sale to the students or bookstore,
 as applicable, each individual item of instructional material as a
 separate, unbundled item; and
 (2)  price the individual items in the textbook bundle
 so that the total cost of purchasing all of the items included in
 the textbook bundle individually would be the same, or as
 reasonably close to the same as practicable, as the price of the
 textbook bundle.
 (c) An institution of higher education shall:
 (1)  maintain a record of any publisher that violates
 Subsection (b); and
 (2)  submit the record to the coordinating board, in
 the time and manner established by coordinating board rule, to use
 in determining whether to assess an administrative penalty under
 Subsection (d).
 (d)  The coordinating board shall adopt rules under which the
 coordinating board may impose a reasonable administrative penalty
 against a publisher that violates this section. The rules must
 require the coordinating board to provide for a hearing to
 determine whether a penalty is to be imposed and the amount of any
 penalty. The coordinating board shall base the amount of any
 penalty on:
 (1) the seriousness of the violation;
 (2) any history of a previous violation;
 (3) the amount necessary to deter a future violation;
 (4) any effort to correct the violation; and
 (5) any other matter justice requires.
 (e)  The attorney general may bring an action to collect an
 administrative penalty that is not paid as directed by the
 coordinating board.
 (f)  Revenue collected from administrative penalties imposed
 under this section shall be deposited to the credit of the general
 revenue fund and may be appropriated only to fund the TEXAS grant
 program administered under Subchapter M, Chapter 56.
 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 instructional material offered for sale on or after September 1,
 2010.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 * * * * *