1 | 1 | | By: Davis S.B. No. 1466 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2009; March 17, 2009, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources; |
---|
4 | 4 | | March 25, 2009, rereferred to Committee on Transportation and |
---|
5 | 5 | | Homeland Security; May 4, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
6 | 6 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 2; |
---|
7 | 7 | | May 4, 2009, sent to printer.) |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1466 By: Davis |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to the procurement of certain cement by the Texas |
---|
14 | 14 | | Department of Transportation. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter I, Chapter 201, Transportation Code, |
---|
17 | 17 | | is amended by adding Section 201.711 to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | Sec. 201.711. EXPENDITURES FOR CEMENT. (a) This section |
---|
19 | 19 | | applies only to a department contract that involves the use of |
---|
20 | 20 | | cement that is produced in an area of the state that, on January 1, |
---|
21 | 21 | | 2009, was classified as a moderate nonattainment area for the |
---|
22 | 22 | | eight-hour ozone standard by the United States Environmental |
---|
23 | 23 | | Protection Agency under 42 U.S.C. Section 7511. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (b) In procuring the cement, either directly or through a |
---|
25 | 25 | | subcontract, the department shall specify as the base bid, |
---|
26 | 26 | | proposal, or offer, cement produced from a portland cement kiln |
---|
27 | 27 | | that meets or exceeds regulatory requirements for emissions of |
---|
28 | 28 | | nitrogen oxide from a portland cement kiln that: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (1) utilizes a dry raw material feed precalciner |
---|
30 | 30 | | pyroprocessing technology; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (2) is located in an area that, on January 1, 2009, was |
---|
32 | 32 | | classified as a moderate nonattainment area for the eight-hour |
---|
33 | 33 | | ozone standard by the United States Environmental Protection Agency |
---|
34 | 34 | | under 42 U.S.C. Section 7511. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 2. Section 201.711, Transportation Code, as added |
---|
36 | 36 | | by this Act, applies only to a request for bids, proposals, or other |
---|
37 | 37 | | offers by or on behalf of the Texas Department of Transportation |
---|
38 | 38 | | that relates to a contract that involves the purchase of cement that |
---|
39 | 39 | | is published on or after September 1, 2009. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
41 | 41 | | * * * * * |
---|