Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1466 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Davis S.B. No. 1466
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 March 25, 2009, rereferred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; May 4, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 2;
 May 4, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1466 By: Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procurement of certain cement by the Texas
 Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter I, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.711 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.711.  EXPENDITURES FOR CEMENT. (a)  This section
 applies only to a department contract that involves the use of
 cement that is produced in an area of the state that, on January 1,
 2009, was classified as a moderate nonattainment area for the
 eight-hour ozone standard by the United States Environmental
 Protection Agency under 42 U.S.C. Section 7511.
 (b)  In procuring the cement, either directly or through a
 subcontract, the department shall specify as the base bid,
 proposal, or offer, cement produced from a portland cement kiln
 that meets or exceeds regulatory requirements for emissions of
 nitrogen oxide from a portland cement kiln that:
 (1)  utilizes a dry raw material feed precalciner
 pyroprocessing technology; and
 (2)  is located in an area that, on January 1, 2009, was
 classified as a moderate nonattainment area for the eight-hour
 ozone standard by the United States Environmental Protection Agency
 under 42 U.S.C. Section 7511.
 SECTION 2. Section 201.711, Transportation Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to a request for bids, proposals, or other
 offers by or on behalf of the Texas Department of Transportation
 that relates to a contract that involves the purchase of cement that
 is published on or after September 1, 2009.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *