Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1467 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Davis, West, Harris S.B. No. 1467
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Government Organization;
 April 28, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 4,
 Nays 3; April 28, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to governmental agency contracts that involve the
 production of cement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 271.907, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (d) A preference provided by Subsection (c) or (e) [The
 preference] may be given only if the cost to the governmental agency
 for the goods or services would not exceed 105 percent of the cost
 of the goods or services provided by a vendor who does not meet the
 standards.
 (e)  A governmental agency procuring goods or services that
 involve the production of cement may give preference to goods or
 services of a vendor that demonstrates that the cement was produced
 from a portland cement kiln that:
 (1)  utilizes a dry raw material feed precalciner
 pyroprocessing technology; and
 (2)  meets or exceeds regulatory requirements for
 emissions of nitrogen oxide.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *