House | 05/21/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3800 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3299 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2244 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |