By: Gallegos S.B. No. 1471 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2009; March 17, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; May 1, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 1, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1471 By: Gallegos A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the evaluation of certain regional planning commissions. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) Before June 1, 2010, the state auditor shall audit a regional planning commission created under Chapter 391, Local Government Code, that includes a county with a population of 3.3 million or more, according to the most recent federal decennial census. The cost of the audit shall be paid for by the regional planning commission. (b) On or before June 1, 2010, the state auditor shall submit a report of an audit conducted under Subsection (a) of this section to: (1) the commissioners court of a county with a population of 3.3 million or more, according to the most recent federal decennial census, that is a member of a regional planning commission described by Subsection (a) of this section; and (2) the governing body of any other political subdivision that is a member of a regional planning commission described by Subsection (a) of this section, if the governing body requests a report from the state auditor. (c) This section expires January 1, 2011. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *