House | 05/12/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1569 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1121 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1120 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1120 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1120 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1120 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1016 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 568 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 568 | |
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |