House | 05/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3939 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2427 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2427 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2134 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1687 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1687 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1687 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Jackson | Journal Page: 1685 |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1685 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 570 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 570 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |