Senate | 05/07/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 2101 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1711 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 572 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 572 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |