Senate | 05/08/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1418 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 573 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |