1 | 1 | | By: Uresti S.B. No. 1543 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2009; March 17, 2009, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0; April 23, 2009, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1543 By: Watson |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to the establishment of the Interagency Literacy Council |
---|
13 | 13 | | for the study, promotion, and enhancement of literacy in this |
---|
14 | 14 | | state. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle B, Title 4, Labor Code, is amended by |
---|
17 | 17 | | adding Chapter 312 to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | CHAPTER 312. INTERAGENCY LITERACY COUNCIL |
---|
19 | 19 | | Sec. 312.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "council" means |
---|
20 | 20 | | the Interagency Literacy Council established under this chapter. |
---|
21 | 21 | | Sec. 312.002. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Interagency |
---|
22 | 22 | | Literacy Council is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas |
---|
23 | 23 | | Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that |
---|
24 | 24 | | chapter, the council is abolished and this chapter expires |
---|
25 | 25 | | September 1, 2019. |
---|
26 | 26 | | Sec. 312.003. ESTABLISHMENT AND COMPOSITION. (a) The |
---|
27 | 27 | | commission shall establish the Interagency Literacy Council. The |
---|
28 | 28 | | council is composed of nine members as follows: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (1) a representative of the commission, appointed by |
---|
30 | 30 | | the executive director; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (2) a representative of the Texas Education Agency, |
---|
32 | 32 | | appointed by the commissioner of education; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (3) a representative of the Texas Higher Education |
---|
34 | 34 | | Coordinating Board, appointed by the commissioner of higher |
---|
35 | 35 | | education; and |
---|
36 | 36 | | (4) six public members who are leaders of the business |
---|
37 | 37 | | or nonprofit community engaged in literacy promotion efforts, |
---|
38 | 38 | | appointed by the executive director of the commission. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (b) The representative appointed under Subsection (a)(1) |
---|
40 | 40 | | shall serve as the presiding officer of the council. |
---|
41 | 41 | | Sec. 312.004. COMMISSION DUTIES. The commission shall |
---|
42 | 42 | | provide staff and resources as necessary for the operation of the |
---|
43 | 43 | | council. |
---|
44 | 44 | | Sec. 312.005. TERMS; VACANCY. (a) Members of the council |
---|
45 | 45 | | serve two-year terms, with the terms expiring February 1 of each |
---|
46 | 46 | | odd-numbered year. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (b) A member may be reappointed. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (c) A vacancy on the council shall be filled for the |
---|
49 | 49 | | remainder of the unexpired term in the same manner as provided by |
---|
50 | 50 | | Section 312.003(a). |
---|
51 | 51 | | Sec. 312.006. MEETINGS. (a) The council shall meet in |
---|
52 | 52 | | person at least three times each year and may hold meetings by |
---|
53 | 53 | | conference call if necessary. The council shall invite |
---|
54 | 54 | | stakeholders to participate in at least one council meeting each |
---|
55 | 55 | | year and provide an opportunity for submission of oral or written |
---|
56 | 56 | | testimony. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (b) Section 551.125, Government Code, applies to a meeting |
---|
58 | 58 | | held by conference call under this section, except that Section |
---|
59 | 59 | | 551.125(b), Government Code, does not apply. |
---|
60 | 60 | | Sec. 312.007. COMPENSATION; REIMBURSEMENT. (a) A member |
---|
61 | 61 | | of the council may not receive compensation for service on the |
---|
62 | 62 | | council. |
---|
63 | 63 | | (b) A public member may be reimbursed for the member's |
---|
64 | 64 | | actual and necessary expenses for meals, lodging, and |
---|
65 | 65 | | transportation incurred while performing council business, subject |
---|
66 | 66 | | to any applicable limitation on reimbursement prescribed by the |
---|
67 | 67 | | General Appropriations Act. |
---|
68 | 68 | | Sec. 312.008. COUNCIL POWERS AND DUTIES. The council |
---|
69 | 69 | | shall: |
---|
70 | 70 | | (1) study current research to assess the adult |
---|
71 | 71 | | literacy needs in this state, including literacy needs relating to |
---|
72 | 72 | | business and finance, workforce and technology, civics, and health |
---|
73 | 73 | | and wellness; |
---|
74 | 74 | | (2) consult with key stakeholders to identify: |
---|
75 | 75 | | (A) barriers to improving literacy; and |
---|
76 | 76 | | (B) evidence-based best practices for improving |
---|
77 | 77 | | literacy; |
---|
78 | 78 | | (3) review the status of the programs and services |
---|
79 | 79 | | administered by each agency or entity represented on the council |
---|
80 | 80 | | that promote literacy in an effort to coordinate efforts, align |
---|
81 | 81 | | services, reduce redundancies, implement best practices, integrate |
---|
82 | 82 | | support services, and improve accountability; |
---|
83 | 83 | | (4) build existing funding streams and identify |
---|
84 | 84 | | additional state and federal funding sources available for the |
---|
85 | 85 | | promotion of literacy in this state; and |
---|
86 | 86 | | (5) raise literacy awareness and engage community |
---|
87 | 87 | | leaders in creative solution building for improving literacy in |
---|
88 | 88 | | this state. |
---|
89 | 89 | | Sec. 312.009. STATEWIDE LITERACY PLAN; REPORT. (a) The |
---|
90 | 90 | | council shall develop a comprehensive statewide action plan for the |
---|
91 | 91 | | improvement of literacy in this state, including a recommended |
---|
92 | 92 | | timeline for implementation. |
---|
93 | 93 | | (b) The council shall submit to both houses of the |
---|
94 | 94 | | legislature, the governor, and the Texas Workforce Investment |
---|
95 | 95 | | Council on or before November 1 of each even-numbered year a written |
---|
96 | 96 | | report on: |
---|
97 | 97 | | (1) the development of the council's statewide action |
---|
98 | 98 | | plan; |
---|
99 | 99 | | (2) the actions taken in furtherance of the plan; |
---|
100 | 100 | | (3) the areas that need improvement in implementing |
---|
101 | 101 | | the plan; |
---|
102 | 102 | | (4) any change to the plan; and |
---|
103 | 103 | | (5) the programs and services that address literacy |
---|
104 | 104 | | needs in this state. |
---|
105 | 105 | | Sec. 312.010. GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. The commission |
---|
106 | 106 | | may accept for the council a gift, grant, or donation from any |
---|
107 | 107 | | source to carry out the purposes of this chapter. |
---|
108 | 108 | | Sec. 312.011. RULES. The commission may adopt rules |
---|
109 | 109 | | necessary to implement this chapter. |
---|
110 | 110 | | SECTION 2. (a) The Interagency Literacy Council shall |
---|
111 | 111 | | submit the initial report required under Subsection (b), Section |
---|
112 | 112 | | 312.009, Labor Code, as added by this Act, not later than November |
---|
113 | 113 | | 1, 2012. |
---|
114 | 114 | | (b) As soon as practicable after the effective date of this |
---|
115 | 115 | | Act, the designated appointing officials shall appoint the members |
---|
116 | 116 | | to the Interagency Literacy Council established under Chapter 312, |
---|
117 | 117 | | Labor Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
118 | 118 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
119 | 119 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
120 | 120 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
121 | 121 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
122 | 122 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
123 | 123 | | * * * * * |
---|