By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1553 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2009; March 17, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence; April 15, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 15, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1553 By: Wentworth A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of district courts in certain counties. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) Effective January 1, 2011, Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.575 to read as follows: Sec. 24.575. 431ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT (DENTON COUNTY). The 431st Judicial District is composed of Denton County. (b) The 431st Judicial District is created on January 1, 2011. SECTION 2. (a) Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.576 to read as follows: Sec. 24.576. 432ND JUDICIAL DISTRICT (TARRANT COUNTY). (a) The 432nd Judicial District is composed of Tarrant County. (b) The 432nd District Court shall give preference to criminal matters. (b) The 432nd Judicial District is created on the effective date of this Act. SECTION 3. (a) Effective October 1, 2009, Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.580 to read as follows: Sec. 24.580. 436TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). (a) The 436th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County. (b) The 436th District Court shall give preference to juvenile matters. (b) The 436th Judicial District is created on October 1, 2009. SECTION 4. (a) Effective January 1, 2010, Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.581 to read as follows: Sec. 24.581. 437TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). (a) The 437th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County. (b) The 437th District Court shall give preference to criminal matters. (b) The 437th Judicial District is created on January 1, 2010. SECTION 5. (a) Effective September 1, 2010, Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.582 to read as follows: Sec. 24.582. 438TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). (a) The 438th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County. (b) The 438th District Court shall give preference to civil matters. (b) The 438th Judicial District is created on September 1, 2010. SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *