1 | 1 | | By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1553 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 6 | | relating to the creation of district courts in certain counties. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. (a) Effective January 1, 2011, Subchapter C, |
---|
9 | 9 | | Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.575 to |
---|
10 | 10 | | read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 24.575. 431ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT (DENTON COUNTY). The |
---|
12 | 12 | | 431st Judicial District is composed of Denton County. |
---|
13 | 13 | | (b) The 431st Judicial District is created on January 1, |
---|
14 | 14 | | 2011. |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 2. (a) Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code, |
---|
16 | 16 | | is amended by adding Section 24.576 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 24.576. 432ND JUDICIAL DISTRICT (TARRANT COUNTY). |
---|
18 | 18 | | (a) The 432nd Judicial District is composed of Tarrant County. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (b) The 432nd District Court shall give preference to |
---|
20 | 20 | | criminal matters. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) The 432nd Judicial District is created on the effective |
---|
22 | 22 | | date of this Act. |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 3. (a) Effective October 1, 2009, Subchapter C, |
---|
24 | 24 | | Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.580 to |
---|
25 | 25 | | read as follows: |
---|
26 | 26 | | Sec. 24.580. 436TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). |
---|
27 | 27 | | (a) The 436th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) The 436th District Court shall give preference to |
---|
29 | 29 | | juvenile matters. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (b) The 436th Judicial District is created on October 1, |
---|
31 | 31 | | 2009. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 4. (a) Effective December 15, 2009, Subchapter C, |
---|
33 | 33 | | Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.581 to |
---|
34 | 34 | | read as follows: |
---|
35 | 35 | | Sec. 24.581. 437TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). |
---|
36 | 36 | | (a) The 437th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (b) The 437th District Court shall give preference to |
---|
38 | 38 | | criminal matters. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (b) The 437th Judicial District is created on December 15, |
---|
40 | 40 | | 2009. |
---|
41 | 41 | | SECTION 5. (a) Effective September 1, 2010, Subchapter C, |
---|
42 | 42 | | Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.582 to |
---|
43 | 43 | | read as follows: |
---|
44 | 44 | | Sec. 24.582. 438TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY). |
---|
45 | 45 | | (a) The 438th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (b) The 438th District Court shall give preference to civil |
---|
47 | 47 | | matters. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (b) The 438th Judicial District is created on September 1, |
---|
49 | 49 | | 2010. |
---|
50 | 50 | | SECTION 6. This Act does not make an appropriation. A |
---|
51 | 51 | | provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program, |
---|
52 | 52 | | creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental |
---|
53 | 53 | | entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the |
---|
54 | 54 | | legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the |
---|
55 | 55 | | provision. |
---|
56 | 56 | | SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|