Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1553 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1553


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of district courts in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) Effective January 1, 2011, Subchapter C,
 Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.575 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.575.  431ST JUDICIAL DISTRICT (DENTON COUNTY).  The
 431st Judicial District is composed of Denton County.
 (b) The 431st Judicial District is created on January 1,
 2011.
 SECTION 2. (a) Subchapter C, Chapter 24, Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 24.576 to read as follows:
 Sec. 24.576.  432ND JUDICIAL DISTRICT (TARRANT COUNTY).
 (a)  The 432nd Judicial District is composed of Tarrant County.
 (b)  The 432nd District Court shall give preference to
 criminal matters.
 (b) The 432nd Judicial District is created on the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. (a) Effective October 1, 2009, Subchapter C,
 Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.580 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.580.  436TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY).
 (a)  The 436th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County.
 (b)  The 436th District Court shall give preference to
 juvenile matters.
 (b) The 436th Judicial District is created on October 1,
 2009.
 SECTION 4. (a) Effective December 15, 2009, Subchapter C,
 Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.581 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.581.  437TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY).
 (a)  The 437th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County.
 (b)  The 437th District Court shall give preference to
 criminal matters.
 (b) The 437th Judicial District is created on December 15,
 2009.
 SECTION 5. (a) Effective September 1, 2010, Subchapter C,
 Chapter 24, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 24.582 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.582.  438TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT (BEXAR COUNTY).
 (a)  The 438th Judicial District is composed of Bexar County.
 (b)  The 438th District Court shall give preference to civil
 matters.
 (b) The 438th Judicial District is created on September 1,
 2010.
 SECTION 6. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.