E | 05/27/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/27/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4093 | |
E | 05/19/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2568 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4073 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2534 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2568 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2465 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#875 | Journal Page: 3725 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3725 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3725 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3713 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3713 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB3730 | Journal Page: 3713 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3953 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2861 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2207 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1320 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1319 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1319 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1319 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 574 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 574 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |