Senate | 05/19/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2394 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 574 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 574 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |