1 | 1 | | By: Shapiro S.B. No. 1561 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2009; March 17, 2009, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 14, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 14, 2009, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1561 By: Averitt |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to developing a developmental education plan for students |
---|
13 | 13 | | entering public institutions of higher education. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is |
---|
16 | 16 | | amended by adding Section 61.07611 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 61.07611. DEVELOPMENTAL EDUCATION PLAN; REPORT. |
---|
18 | 18 | | (a) To serve students who require developmental education in an |
---|
19 | 19 | | effective and cost-effective manner, the board shall develop a |
---|
20 | 20 | | statewide plan for developmental education to be provided under |
---|
21 | 21 | | Section 51.3062 that: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) assigns primary responsibility for developmental |
---|
23 | 23 | | education to public junior colleges and public technical |
---|
24 | 24 | | institutes; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | (2) provides for using technology, to the greatest |
---|
26 | 26 | | extent practicable consistent with best practices, to provide |
---|
27 | 27 | | developmental education to students. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) In developing the developmental education plan, the |
---|
29 | 29 | | board shall: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (1) research issues related to developmental |
---|
31 | 31 | | education; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) study and develop best practices for successful |
---|
33 | 33 | | developmental education programs, including through use of pilot |
---|
34 | 34 | | programs; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | (3) assess various methods of providing developmental |
---|
36 | 36 | | education to students to determine which methods, if any, should be |
---|
37 | 37 | | implemented on a statewide basis. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (c) Developmental education under the plan must include: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) technological delivery of developmental education |
---|
40 | 40 | | courses that allows students to complete course work; |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) diagnostic assessments to determine a student's |
---|
42 | 42 | | specific educational needs to allow for appropriate developmental |
---|
43 | 43 | | instruction; |
---|
44 | 44 | | (3) modular developmental education course materials; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (4) employment of tutors and instructional aides to |
---|
46 | 46 | | supplement developmental education course instruction as needed |
---|
47 | 47 | | for particular students; |
---|
48 | 48 | | (5) an internal monitoring mechanism to identify a |
---|
49 | 49 | | student's area of academic difficulty; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (6) periodic updates of developmental education |
---|
51 | 51 | | course materials; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | (7) assessments after completion of a developmental |
---|
53 | 53 | | education course to determine a student's readiness to enroll in |
---|
54 | 54 | | freshman-level academic courses. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (d) The developmental education plan must provide for: |
---|
56 | 56 | | (1) ongoing training for developmental education |
---|
57 | 57 | | program faculty members, tutors, and instructional aides at the |
---|
58 | 58 | | institutions or other locations where those persons provide |
---|
59 | 59 | | instruction; and |
---|
60 | 60 | | (2) ongoing research and improvement of appropriate |
---|
61 | 61 | | developmental education programs, including participation by a |
---|
62 | 62 | | group of institution of higher education faculty members selected |
---|
63 | 63 | | by the board, to: |
---|
64 | 64 | | (A) monitor results of the programs; |
---|
65 | 65 | | (B) identify successful and unsuccessful program |
---|
66 | 66 | | components; and |
---|
67 | 67 | | (C) identify possible solutions to program |
---|
68 | 68 | | problems. |
---|
69 | 69 | | (e) Not later than December 1, 2010, the board shall submit |
---|
70 | 70 | | to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of |
---|
71 | 71 | | representatives, and the presiding officer of each legislative |
---|
72 | 72 | | standing committee with primary jurisdiction over higher education |
---|
73 | 73 | | a report concerning the initial development of the developmental |
---|
74 | 74 | | education plan under this section, including any recommendations |
---|
75 | 75 | | for redesign or reassignment among institutions of higher education |
---|
76 | 76 | | of existing programs or implementation of new programs and, if |
---|
77 | 77 | | appropriate, recommendations for legislation. This subsection |
---|
78 | 78 | | expires January 1, 2011. |
---|
79 | 79 | | SECTION 2. This Act does not make an appropriation. A |
---|
80 | 80 | | provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program, |
---|
81 | 81 | | creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental |
---|
82 | 82 | | entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the |
---|
83 | 83 | | legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the |
---|
84 | 84 | | provision. |
---|
85 | 85 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
86 | 86 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
87 | 87 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
88 | 88 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
89 | 89 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
90 | 90 | | * * * * * |
---|