House | 05/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3786 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1011 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1011 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 919 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 363 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 196 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 196 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |