House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4078
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2552
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2027
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2027
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 2027
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2027
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2027
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1874
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 578
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 578
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|