Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1600 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1600
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 17, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 30, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; April 30, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1600 By: Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an interim study on the creation of a data collection to
 track specialized technology research projects conducted by public
 universities, public university research facilities, and other
 state institutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. INTERIM STUDY REGARDING TECHNOLOGY RESEARCH DATA
 COLLECTION. (a) A select interim committee is created to study
 the feasibility of collecting data and maintaining a searchable
 electronic database, search engine, or other collection of data
 (data collection) relating to specialized technology research
 projects that are developed or conducted at public universities in
 this state, research facilities of public universities in this
 state, or other facilities operated by a state agency, in order to
 facilitate coordination among the universities and facilities on
 the projects and improve access to and awareness of the specialized
 research and technologies developed at those institutions and
 facilities.
 (b) The study must consider:
 (1) appropriate entities to administer the data
 collection, including nonprofit organizations, public universities
 in this state, or state agencies;
 (2) the extent of legislative oversight required for
 an entity that would maintain the data collection;
 (3) compliance with state and federal laws regarding
 access to public information; and
 (4) the information the data collection would include,
 such as:
 (A) a list of projects involving one or more of
 the following areas:
 (i) energy research, including methods of
 creation, storage, distribution, and conservation of energy;
 (ii) biomedical science research;
 (iii) nanotechnology research, including
 nanomedicine; and
 (iv) other specialized technology
 research;
 (B) for each project listed under Paragraph (A)
 of this subdivision, a brief description of the project, including
 the field of technology involved, the entity involved with the
 project, and additional comments regarding the research the Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board considers appropriate; and
 (C) other relevant information and available
 resources in this state relating to specialized technology
 research, including:
 (i) expert faculty or research personnel;
 (ii) available technology and patents
 obtained;
 (iii) the location of and policies for the
 use of available research equipment; and
 (iv) public grants or contracts awarded.
 (c) The study shall examine the current state of access to
 public information about specialized technology research projects
 and shall assess the best methods of facilitating access to the
 information. In addition, the study shall consider what
 information should be accessible by the general public and what
 information, if any, should have restricted access.
 (d) The committee shall be composed of:
 (1) representatives of the following institutions,
 with one member named by each institution: The University of Texas
 at Austin, Texas A&M University, Texas Tech University, the
 University of Houston, the University of North Texas, The
 University of Texas at Arlington, The University of Texas at
 Dallas, The University of Texas at El Paso, and The University of
 Texas at San Antonio; and
 (2) a number of members appointed by the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board as the coordinating board considers
 appropriate to represent the coordinating board, data collection
 providers, and the technology industry.
 (e) On the request of the committee, a general academic
 institution of higher education, research facility of a general
 academic institution of higher education, or other facility
 operated by a state agency shall provide to the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board or advisory committee any information
 necessary for the board or advisory committee to perform its duties
 under this section.
 SECTION 2. COMMITTEE REPORT. Not later than December 1,
 2010, the committee shall report the committee's findings and
 recommendations to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the governor. The committee shall
 include in its recommendations specific legislation that the
 committee considers desirable to address the need for and
 feasibility of establishing a data collection as determined by the
 committee's findings.
 SECTION 3. ABOLITION OF COMMITTEE. The committee is
 abolished and this Act expires January 16, 2011.
 SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *