Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1612 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1612


 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of information by health and human
 services agencies to assist children with velocardiofacial
 syndrome.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 117, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 117.076 to read as follows:
 Sec. 117.076.  INFORMATION REGARDING VELOCARDIOFACIAL
 SYNDROME. (a)  The commission shall ensure that each health and
 human services agency that provides intervention services to young
 children is provided with information developed by the commission
 regarding velocardiofacial syndrome.
 (b)  Each health and human services agency described by
 Subsection (a) shall provide the information regarding
 velocardiofacial syndrome to appropriate health care coordinators
 and therapists and to parents of a child who is known by the agency
 to have at least two of the following conditions:
 (1) hypotonicity;
 (2) communication delay;
 (3) articulation disorder;
 (4) resonance disorder;
 (5)  nasal regurgitation during feeding as an infant
 with no history of a cleft palate;
 (6)  recurrent ear infections as well as diagnosis of
 cardiac anomaly, feeding disorder, cleft palate, or submucosal
 cleft palate; or
 (7) fine motor or gross motor skills delay.
 (c)  The commission shall develop the information required
 under Subsection (a) using medically accurate, peer-reviewed
 literature. The information must include:
 (1)  an explanation of velocardiofacial syndrome
 symptoms, diagnosis, and treatment options;
 (2)  information on relevant state agency and nonprofit
 resources, parent support groups, and available Medicaid waiver
 programs; and
 (3)  a recommendation for follow-up with a health care
 provider for evaluation of the underlying etiology and an
 explanation that the existence of any of the conditions listed in
 Subsection (b) will not necessarily result in a diagnosis of
 velocardiofacial syndrome.
 (d)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary
 to implement this section.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1612 passed the Senate on
 April 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1612 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor