Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1634 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Carona S.B. No. 1634
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2009; March 20, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 3; April 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to service charges for certain renewals of driver's
 licenses and personal identification certificates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter R, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.429 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.429.  SERVICE CHARGE FOR CERTAIN TRANSACTIONS.
 (a)  The department shall impose a service charge of $5 for each
 renewal driver's license or personal identification certificate
 for which an application is filed in person if the applicant is
 eligible to apply for renewal by mail, by telephone, or by an
 electronic means provided by the department.
 (b)  A driver's license or personal identification
 certificate renewal notice issued by the department must contain
 information regarding the service charge imposed under this
 section.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *