Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1645 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 S.B. No. 1645
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the distribution of a prescription drug and a study of
66 the feasibility of establishing separate reimbursement under the
77 Medicaid vendor drug program for certain pharmacy care management
88 services.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. DEFINITION. In this Act, "pharmacy care
1111 management services" means services provided by a pharmacy to
1212 support patients receiving treatment or therapy through a specialty
1313 pharmacy drug or therapy and maximize adherence to the drug or
1414 therapy, including:
1515 (1) significant caregiver and provider contact and
1616 education regarding the relevant disease, disease prevention and
1717 treatment, and counseling related to drug indications, benefits,
1818 risks, complications, and appropriate use of the prescribed drug or
1919 therapy;
2020 (2) patient compliance services, including
2121 coordination of provider visits with delivery of the specialty drug
2222 or therapy to the provider, compliance with the dosing regimen,
2323 patient reminders, compilation of data, and assisting providers in
2424 the development of compliance programs; and
2525 (3) tracking services, including developing ordering
2626 processes with a provider, screening referrals, and tracking a
2727 patient's weight for dosing requirements.
2828 SECTION 2. STUDY. (a) The Health and Human Services
2929 Commission shall study the feasibility of establishing separate
3030 reimbursement rates under the Medicaid vendor drug program for
3131 pharmacies that provide pharmacy care management services to
3232 patients who are administered specialty pharmacy drugs, including
3333 drugs indicated for the prophylaxis of respiratory syncytial virus,
3434 blood factor, or any other biologic or therapy that requires
3535 complex care.
3636 (b) In conducting the study under Subsection (a) of this
3737 section, the Health and Human Services Commission shall consult
3838 with the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and may
3939 consider the adoption of pharmacy care management services
4040 reimbursement for pharmacy services adopted by other state Medicaid
4141 programs.
4242 (c) The Health and Human Services Commission shall seek
4343 information from specialty pharmacy providers or other sources
4444 regarding the costs of providing pharmacy care management services.
4545 (d) Not later than September 1, 2010, the Health and Human
4646 Services Commission shall submit a written report of the results of
4747 the study conducted under Subsection (a) of this section to the
4848 legislature.
4949 SECTION 3. NORMAL DISTRIBUTION CHANNEL. Subdivision (5),
5050 Section 431.401, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as
5151 follows:
5252 (5) "Normal distribution channel" means a chain of
5353 custody for a prescription drug, either directly or by drop
5454 shipment, from the manufacturer of the prescription drug, the
5555 manufacturer to the manufacturer's co-licensed product partner,
5656 the manufacturer to the manufacturer's third-party logistics
5757 provider, or the manufacturer to the manufacturer's exclusive
5858 distributor, to:
5959 (A) a pharmacy to:
6060 (i) a patient; or
6161 (ii) another designated person authorized
6262 by law to dispense or administer the drug to a patient;
6363 (B) an authorized distributor of record to:
6464 (i) a pharmacy to a patient; or
6565 (ii) another designated person authorized
6666 by law to dispense or administer the drug to a patient;
6767 (C) an authorized distributor of record to a
6868 wholesale distributor licensed under this chapter to another
6969 designated person authorized by law to administer the drug to a
7070 patient;
7171 (D) an authorized distributor of record to a
7272 pharmacy warehouse to the pharmacy warehouse's intracompany
7373 pharmacy;
7474 (E) [(D)] a pharmacy warehouse to the pharmacy
7575 warehouse's intracompany pharmacy or another designated person
7676 authorized by law to dispense or administer the drug to a patient;
7777 (F) [(E)] a person authorized by law to prescribe
7878 a prescription drug that by law may be administered only under the
7979 supervision of the prescriber; or
8080 (G) [(F)] an authorized distributor of record to
8181 one other authorized distributor of record to a licensed
8282 practitioner for office use.
8383 SECTION 4. EXEMPTION FROM CERTAIN PROVISIONS FOR CERTAIN
8484 WHOLESALE DISTRIBUTORS. Section 431.4031, Health and Safety Code,
8585 is amended to read as follows:
8686 Sec. 431.4031. EXEMPTION FROM CERTAIN PROVISIONS FOR
8787 CERTAIN WHOLESALE DISTRIBUTORS. (a) A wholesale distributor that
8888 distributes prescription drugs that are medical gases or a
8989 wholesale distributor that is a manufacturer or a third-party
9090 logistics provider on behalf of a manufacturer is exempt from
9191 Sections 431.404(a)(5) and (6), (b), and (c), 431.4045(2), 431.405,
9292 431.407, and 431.408.
9393 (b) A state agency or a political subdivision of this state
9494 that distributes prescription drugs using federal or state funding
9595 to nonprofit health care facilities or local mental health or
9696 mental retardation authorities for distribution to a pharmacy,
9797 practitioner, or patient is exempt from Sections 431.405(b),
9898 431.407, 431.408, 431.412, and 431.413.
9999 (c) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
100100 Services Commission by rule may exempt specific purchases of
101101 prescription drugs by state agencies and political subdivisions of
102102 this state if the executive commissioner determines that the
103103 requirements of this subchapter would result in a substantial cost
104104 to the state or a political subdivision of the state.
105105 SECTION 5. RULES. As soon as practicable after the
106106 effective date of this Act, the executive commissioner of the
107107 Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt, modify, or repeal
108108 rules as necessary to implement the changes in law made by this Act
109109 to Chapter 431, Health and Safety Code.
110110 SECTION 6. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
111111 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
112112 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
113113 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
114114 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
115115 ______________________________ ______________________________
116116 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
117117 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1645 passed the Senate on
118118 May 7, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; May 30, 2009,
119119 Senate refused to concur in House amendment and requested
120120 appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House granted
121121 request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted Conference
122122 Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
123123 ______________________________
124124 Secretary of the Senate
125125 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1645 passed the House, with
126126 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
127127 Nays 11, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted
128128 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
129129 May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
130130 following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, one present not voting.
131131 ______________________________
132132 Chief Clerk of the House
133133 Approved:
134134 ______________________________
135135 Date
136136 ______________________________
137137 Governor