Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1645 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1645


 AN ACT
 relating to the distribution of a prescription drug and a study of
 the feasibility of establishing separate reimbursement under the
 Medicaid vendor drug program for certain pharmacy care management
 services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. DEFINITION. In this Act, "pharmacy care
 management services" means services provided by a pharmacy to
 support patients receiving treatment or therapy through a specialty
 pharmacy drug or therapy and maximize adherence to the drug or
 therapy, including:
 (1) significant caregiver and provider contact and
 education regarding the relevant disease, disease prevention and
 treatment, and counseling related to drug indications, benefits,
 risks, complications, and appropriate use of the prescribed drug or
 therapy;
 (2) patient compliance services, including
 coordination of provider visits with delivery of the specialty drug
 or therapy to the provider, compliance with the dosing regimen,
 patient reminders, compilation of data, and assisting providers in
 the development of compliance programs; and
 (3) tracking services, including developing ordering
 processes with a provider, screening referrals, and tracking a
 patient's weight for dosing requirements.
 SECTION 2. STUDY. (a) The Health and Human Services
 Commission shall study the feasibility of establishing separate
 reimbursement rates under the Medicaid vendor drug program for
 pharmacies that provide pharmacy care management services to
 patients who are administered specialty pharmacy drugs, including
 drugs indicated for the prophylaxis of respiratory syncytial virus,
 blood factor, or any other biologic or therapy that requires
 complex care.
 (b) In conducting the study under Subsection (a) of this
 section, the Health and Human Services Commission shall consult
 with the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and may
 consider the adoption of pharmacy care management services
 reimbursement for pharmacy services adopted by other state Medicaid
 programs.
 (c) The Health and Human Services Commission shall seek
 information from specialty pharmacy providers or other sources
 regarding the costs of providing pharmacy care management services.
 (d) Not later than September 1, 2010, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall submit a written report of the results of
 the study conducted under Subsection (a) of this section to the
 legislature.
 SECTION 3. NORMAL DISTRIBUTION CHANNEL. Subdivision (5),
 Section 431.401, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (5) "Normal distribution channel" means a chain of
 custody for a prescription drug, either directly or by drop
 shipment, from the manufacturer of the prescription drug, the
 manufacturer to the manufacturer's co-licensed product partner,
 the manufacturer to the manufacturer's third-party logistics
 provider, or the manufacturer to the manufacturer's exclusive
 distributor, to:
 (A) a pharmacy to:
 (i) a patient; or
 (ii) another designated person authorized
 by law to dispense or administer the drug to a patient;
 (B) an authorized distributor of record to:
 (i) a pharmacy to a patient; or
 (ii) another designated person authorized
 by law to dispense or administer the drug to a patient;
 (C) an authorized distributor of record to a
 wholesale distributor licensed under this chapter to another
 designated person authorized by law to administer the drug to a
 patient;
 (D) an authorized distributor of record to a
 pharmacy warehouse to the pharmacy warehouse's intracompany
 pharmacy;
 (E) [(D)] a pharmacy warehouse to the pharmacy
 warehouse's intracompany pharmacy or another designated person
 authorized by law to dispense or administer the drug to a patient;
 (F) [(E)] a person authorized by law to prescribe
 a prescription drug that by law may be administered only under the
 supervision of the prescriber; or
 (G) [(F)] an authorized distributor of record to
 one other authorized distributor of record to a licensed
 practitioner for office use.
 SECTION 4. EXEMPTION FROM CERTAIN PROVISIONS FOR CERTAIN
 WHOLESALE DISTRIBUTORS. Section 431.4031, Health and Safety Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 431.4031. EXEMPTION FROM CERTAIN PROVISIONS FOR
 CERTAIN WHOLESALE DISTRIBUTORS. (a) A wholesale distributor that
 distributes prescription drugs that are medical gases or a
 wholesale distributor that is a manufacturer or a third-party
 logistics provider on behalf of a manufacturer is exempt from
 Sections 431.404(a)(5) and (6), (b), and (c), 431.4045(2), 431.405,
 431.407, and 431.408.
 (b)  A state agency or a political subdivision of this state
 that distributes prescription drugs using federal or state funding
 to nonprofit health care facilities or local mental health or
 mental retardation authorities for distribution to a pharmacy,
 practitioner, or patient is exempt from Sections 431.405(b),
 431.407, 431.408, 431.412, and 431.413.
 (c)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission by rule may exempt specific purchases of
 prescription drugs by state agencies and political subdivisions of
 this state if the executive commissioner determines that the
 requirements of this subchapter would result in a substantial cost
 to the state or a political subdivision of the state.
 SECTION 5. RULES. As soon as practicable after the
 effective date of this Act, the executive commissioner of the
 Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt, modify, or repeal
 rules as necessary to implement the changes in law made by this Act
 to Chapter 431, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 6. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1645 passed the Senate on
 May 7, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; May 30, 2009,
 Senate refused to concur in House amendment and requested
 appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House granted
 request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted Conference
 Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1645 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
 Nays 11, one present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor