E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4191
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4191
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4191
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4191
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#938
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amended
|
1-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 257
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3801
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 3170
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3170
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2452
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2000
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 624
|
Senate
|
03/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 624
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|