Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1672 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1672


 AN ACT
 relating to extension or modification of restrictive covenants in
 certain residential real estate subdivisions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 201.004, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  If existing originally applicable restrictions provide
 a procedure for extension, that procedure may be used for
 successive extensions of the originally applicable restrictions
 unless the original restriction instrument expressly prohibits the
 procedure from being used for successive extensions.
 SECTION 2. Subdivision (4), Section 210.001, Property Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (4) "Residential real estate subdivision" or
 "subdivision" has the meaning assigned by Section 201.003, except
 that in a county described by Section 210.002(1) a subdivision that
 is a gated community with private streets need not be located in a
 city, town, or village or within the extraterritorial jurisdiction
 of a city, town, or village.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1672 passed the Senate on
 May 5, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1672 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 136,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor